Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a police officer is required to charge by citation for certain misdemeanor or local ordinance violations that do not involve serious injury or an immediate health risk; altering the categories of offenses for which a police officer is authorized to charge by citation; altering the circumstances under which a police officer may charge a defendant by citation; adding a citation for an incarcerable crime as a document that may accompany a certain application for requisition; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {968675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-40)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {968675/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Judiciary 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-40) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:32 PM
Click to return on the top page