Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0669 - 2020RS
   CH0004 - 2021RS
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Prescription Drug Affordability Board)
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law requiring the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to determine a certain funding source by December 31, 2020; requiring the Board to assess and collect a certain fee from certain persons in a certain manner; requiring the Board to calculate a certain fee in a certain manner; requiring entities assessed a certain fee to pay a the fee on or before October 1 each year; establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1095
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Overridden (30-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (97-38)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {327376/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (97-37) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Overridden (30-15)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (97-38)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Fund
(   19-132, 21-2C-11 )
(   15-1601 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page