Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Beidle, Carter, Feldman, Lam, Lee, Pinsky, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of the Environment to prepare a certain recommendation in connection with certain issues considered by the Public Service Commission; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to incorporate an evaluation of the impact of certain electric power plants on climate change into the Power Plant Research Program; requiring the Commission to consider the maintenance of fair and stable labor standards and the protection of the global climate in supervising and regulating certain public service companies; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0531
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-405 )
(   2-113, 7-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:15 PM
Click to return on the top page