Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, Kagan, Lee, Patterson, Pinsky, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to deny inspection by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the part of a public record that contains personal information unless the custodian is provided with a valid warrant or valid subpoena issued by a federal court or a court of this State; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to annually report certain information to the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538474/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538474/1
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538474/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Rejected
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {538474/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {538474/1 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {538474/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Rejected 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:14 PM
Click to return on the top page