Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Institutions of Higher Education - Voter Registration and Voting by Students (Student Voter Empowerment Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Patterson, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections to maintain a page on its website that includes clear information about voter registration and voting by students enrolled in institutions of higher education, including links to information on voting by absentee ballot for students outside the State; requiring a public institution of higher education to designate a staff member as the student voting coordinator; requiring the student voting coordinator to develop and implement a plan to increase student voter registration; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0245
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, January 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Institutions of Higher Education - Voter Registration and Voting by Students (Student Voter Empowerment Act of 2020)
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-303, 3-103, 3-204, 3-204.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:14 PM