Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Access to Firearms – Storage Requirements (Jaelynn’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Elfreth, Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lam, Lee, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Hettleman, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition to prohibit a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where a minor could gain access to the firearm; altering a certain exception to the prohibition; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where an unsupervised minor could gain access to the firearm and an unsupervised minor does gain access to the firearm, and the firearm causes harm to the minor or another person; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0636
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228870/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228870/1
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228870/1
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {743824/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (18-27)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {228870/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {228870/1 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Hough) Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {228870/1 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {463920/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-28) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {743824/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (18-27) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety – Access to Firearms – Storage Requirements (Jaelynn’s Law)
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (29-16) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-104 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:14 PM
Click to return on the top page