Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of School Psychology Services
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide school psychology services provided by a school psychologist who is certified by the State Department of Education to practice school psychology.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of School Psychology Services
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:14 PM