Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a State contribution to a Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan may be made to a limited number of accounts for each qualified beneficiary; limiting, for State contribution application periods after December 31, 2020, a qualified beneficiary from receiving more than two State contributions for each year the qualified beneficiary is eligible for the State contribution; authorizing the Maryland 529 Board to adopt certain regulations; and requiring a certain report to the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894231/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {723223/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {894231/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {894231/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Floor Amendment {723223/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Appropriations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
(   18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-04.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:13 PM
Click to return on the top page