Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the dates by which certain percentages of accessible rooms in a lodging establishment are required to be furnished with a bed of a certain height.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Lodging Establishments – Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities – Deadlines
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Economic Matters 22AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:12 AM
Click to return on the top page