Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine and Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority to work to increase the utilization of certain programs and funds to assist minority and women-owned businesses and consider incentives to encourage the use of certain credit insurance programs; requiring the Authority to develop and implement a certain marketing plan; and requiring the marketing plan implemented in accordance with the Act to identify methods to increase the utilization of certain credit insurance services by certain financial entities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {987876/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {987876/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority - Marketing Plan
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Ways and Means 22AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 7:02 PM
Click to return on the top page