Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring early voting centers to be open during the hours between 7 a.m. and 8 p.m. each early voting day.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0206
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-18)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {244437/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Ways and Means 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (118-18) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page