Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Maryland Judiciary Case Search
Sponsored by
Senators Carter and Sydnor
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Judiciary Case Search on or before October 1, 2020, from in any way referring to the existence of records of certain charges in cases with electronic records; establishing the Partial Expungement Workgroup to study and develop a plan and legislative recommendations for enabling the expungement of certain criminal charges; requiring the Workgroup to report its plan and legislative recommendations to the General Assembly by January 5, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1336
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0328 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {128574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {128574/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Maryland Judiciary Case Search
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judiciary 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-107 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM