Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Hettleman, Hough, Ready, West, Salling, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the circuit court to provide notice to a child's foster parent, preadoptive parent, or caregiver of the right to request to be designated as a party in a certain proceeding except under certain circumstances; authorizing a court, in its discretion, to grant certain status to certain parties in certain proceedings; requiring a court to grant certain status to certain parties in certain proceedings; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908276/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {908276/1
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {908276/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908276/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) Withdrawn
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803123/2 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {603129/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Committee Amendment {908276/1 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Committee Amendment {908276/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hayes) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) Withdrawn 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {803123/2 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {603129/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Judiciary 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
(   3-801, 3-802, 3-816.3 )
(   5-504, 5-525 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM
Click to return on the top page