Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each health care facility, on or after January 1, 2023, to provide in each restroom maintained by the health care facility a hands-free disposable towel dispenser and a device that allows an individual to open a door without touching the door handle; requiring each health care facility to report to the Maryland Department of Health certain information regarding certain restrooms on or before January 1, 2023; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page