Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing annual and special meetings of the members of an electric cooperative to be conducted in person, virtually, or both; requiring the members of the cooperative, by majority vote, to determine in the cooperative's bylaws how meetings may be held; requiring the notice of annual and special meetings to include certain information; altering certain requirements for a quorum; authorizing voting to be conducted in a certain manner in accordance with the cooperative's bylaws; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0648
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967670/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Reassigned to Finance 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {967670/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Economic Matters 22AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Returned Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page