Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Jurisdiction and Maryland Capitol Police
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the Department of General Services to include State-owned or State-leased buildings and grounds and extending to the surrounding area 1,000 feet in any direction from the boundary of those buildings and grounds; providing that, regarding the State legislative buildings in the City of Annapolis, the presiding officers of the General Assembly have final authority over the use of and access to the buildings by members of the General Assembly, their staff, and Department of Legislative Services personnel; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0941
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {363121/1 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Department of General Services - Jurisdiction and Maryland Capitol Police
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Department of General Services - Jurisdiction and Maryland Capitol Police
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Appropriations 49
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Floor Amendment {363121/1 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of General Services - Jurisdiction and Maryland Capitol Police
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Text - Chapter - Department of General Services - Jurisdiction and Maryland Capitol Police
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-601, 4-605, 4-605.1, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM