Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discrimination – Definition of Race – Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Cassilly, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hettleman, Hester, Lam, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Peters, Ready, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining "race", for the purposes of certain laws prohibiting discrimination, to include certain traits associated with race, including hair texture and certain hairstyles; and defining "protective hairstyle" as a hairstyle including braids, twists, and locks.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1444
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {168278/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Discrimination on the Basis of Race – Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {296686/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (130-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {168278/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Discrimination on the Basis of Race – Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 38
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {296686/1 Adopted 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (130-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Discrimination – Definition of Race – Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
Text - Chapter - Discrimination – Definition of Race – Hair Texture and Hairstyles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:09 PM