Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Augustine, Feldman, Guzzone, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Special Education Ombudsman in the Office of the Attorney General to serve as a resource for information and support to parents, students, and educators regarding special education rights and services; requiring the Ombudsman to submit a report concerning the State's special education services by July 1, 2022, and each July 1 thereafter; requiring certain school personnel to provide the parents of a child with a disability written information about the Ombudsman and the toll-free telephone number; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0699
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {453928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {225268/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (132-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-1)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted 43
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Floor Amendment {453928/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-28) 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Ways and Means 47
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {225268/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (132-0) 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-1) 49A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text - Chapter - Office of the Attorney General - Special Education Ombudsman
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-405 )
(   6-501 through 6-506 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:08 PM