Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Elfreth, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to employ a chief inspector; and providing for the salary of the chief inspector to be fixed by the Board as in a general county classified salary schedule, within non-represented pay schedule NR-05.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0680
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754433/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 5:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {353123/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (41-92)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {943325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (39-92)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {223126/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {453122/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (40-93)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {653929/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-91)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {754433/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Hearing 4/05 at 5:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {353123/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (41-92) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {943325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (39-92) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {223126/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {453122/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (40-93) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Floor Amendment {653929/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-91) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page