Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Elfreth, Guzzone, King, McCray, Serafini, Zucker, Eckardt, Edwards, Griffith, Rosapepe, and Salling
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax to $20,000 for certain military retirement income for individuals who are at least 55 years old; increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax to $10,000 for certain retirement income attributable to an individual's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services worker if the individual is at least 55 years old; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {609933/1 Adopted 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Ways and Means 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-207, 10-209 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page