Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Annual Report – Crimes of Violence
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Elfreth, Kagan, Kramer, Waldstreicher, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy to report by December 1, 2021 and each December 1 thereafter, to the Governor, the House Judiciary Committee, and the Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee, certain information for the preceding calendar year for cases involving a crime of violence; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, in consultation with the Commission, to analyze the use of American Bar Association pleas in calendar year 2019 and submit a certain report; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0780
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Vulnerable Adult
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268671/1
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268671/1
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268671/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Vulnerable Adult
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {268671/1 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {268671/1 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments {268671/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Annual Report – Crimes of Violence
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
(   14-101 )
(   6-201, 6-209.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page