Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an advanced practice registered nurse is not precluded from delegating a nursing or other technical task to an assistant under certain circumstances; providing that a registered nurse or a licensed practical nurse is not precluded from delegating a technical task other than a nursing task to an unlicensed individual under certain circumstances; and requiring the State Board of Nursing to adopt certain regulations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0095
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Returned Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page