Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a homeowner's insurance claim under certain circumstances; prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a private passenger motor vehicle insurance claim under certain circumstances; and authorizing certain insurers to consider certain claim information when rating certain insurance policies under certain circumstances.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-32)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {647376/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Economic Matters 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (100-32) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 558
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page