Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Sydnor, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 354
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the membership of the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services to include two additional members from the Department of Juvenile Services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0872
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 354
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Referred Judiciary 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 354
Text - Chapter - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
(   9-101, 9-212 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page