Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to provide transportation to and from school for certain students using a vehicle other than a Type I or Type II school vehicle when a school vehicle cannot reasonably be provided; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with county boards of education and the Motor Vehicle Administration, to adopt regulations governing minimum vehicle and driver safety standards; requiring each county board to submit a report on student transportation using certain vehicles by September 1, 2025; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0072
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664836/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {455961/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
Senate 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {664836/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Ways and Means 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {455961/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Age
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:25 AM
Click to return on the top page