Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Patterson, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the manufacturer of a connected device to equip the device with a certain reasonable security feature; providing that a security feature for a connected device is reasonable if the connected device is equipped with a certain means for authentication; providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice within the meaning of the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to certain enforcement and penalty provisions; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0888
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-301, 14-4201 through 14-4204 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page