Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Hettleman, and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a model policy to support the educational and parenting goals and improve the educational outcomes of pregnant and parenting students; requiring the model policy to include certain policies and procedures; requiring each county board of education to establish a policy based on the Department's model policy; altering the required contents of the pregnant and parenting students attendance policy developed by each county board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0401
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334331/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {773027/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-96)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {613822/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-92)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-15)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {334331/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Amendment {773027/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-96) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Amendment {613822/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (42-92) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (119-15) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page