Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, McCray, Augustine, Beidle, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, King, Smith, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include certain appropriations in the State budget from the Transportation Trust Fund to the Maryland Transit Administration for the operating and capital needs of the Administration in certain fiscal years; requiring that certain capital appropriations to the Administration be in addition to any funds appropriated for the capital planning, engineering, right-of-way acquisition, or construction of the Purple Line; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0368
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:04 PM