Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
No-Knock Warrants - Elimination
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law authorizing an application for a search warrant to contain a request authorizing the executing law enforcement officer to enter a building, apartment, premises, place, or thing to be searched without giving notice of the officer's authority or purpose under certain circumstances; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - No-Knock Warrants - Elimination
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363623/1
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - No-Knock Warrants - Elimination
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {363623/1 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 12:40 PM
Click to return on the top page