Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Eckardt, Klausmeier, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain State and local law enforcement agencies to reimburse individuals who take possession of dogs formerly used in law enforcement work under certain circumstances for reasonable and necessary veterinary treatment; specifying that the reimbursement may be only for certain veterinary treatment and may not exceed $2,500 during a calendar year and $10,000 over the life of the dog; authorizing certain State law enforcement agencies to accept public donations for the payment of certain veterinary expenses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {588779/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {588779/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {588779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {588779/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kramer) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Committee Amendment {588779/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Kramer) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments {588779/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Hough) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {203424/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Judiciary 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page