Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, West, Carter, Cassilly, Hettleman, Hough, Lee, Ready, Smith, Sydnor, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 205
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a physician, qualified health care provider, or hospital to provide a certain notice to the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board regarding that services were rendered to a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse; prohibiting a physician, qualified health care provider, or hospital from including certain information in a request to the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board to obtain payment for services related to certain sexually related crimes under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {258478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 205
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {258478/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Referred Judiciary 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 205
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page