Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Augustine, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Lee, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a candidate who is defeated for the nomination for a public office from filing a certificate of candidacy as a write-in candidate at the next succeeding general election as a candidate for any office.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-7)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Ways and Means 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (125-7) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
(   10-313, 5-303, 5-706 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page