Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, King, Klausmeier, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending and altering the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a $12,500,000 appropriation to the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund for fiscal years 2022 through 2026; altering the purposes for which certain endowment proceeds may be expended; altering certain requirements for certain individuals in certain positions funded by endowment proceeds; altering the distribution of certain revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1585
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-604, 6-612, 6-614, 6-618 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:03 PM