Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services as an independent unit of the State; establishing the Inspector General in the Office; providing for the eligibility, professional qualifications, appointment, term, and removal of the Inspector General; providing for the Inspector General's duties and powers when investigating the management and affairs of the Department of General Services; prohibiting the Inspector General from taking certain actions under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for General Services
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
(   4-101,   4-2A-01 through 4-2A-06 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:13 PM
Click to return on the top page