Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Public Ethics Law - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting legislators and persons acting on behalf of legislators from receiving, depositing, or using a certain contribution, conducting a fund-raising event, or selling or soliciting a ticket to a fundraising event during a special session of the General Assembly except under certain circumstances; and prohibiting legislators from intentionally scheduling a fund-raising event that coincides with a special session of the General Assembly once the special session has been announced.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974739/1
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974739/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {974739/1 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {974739/1 Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Public Ethics Law - Special Session of the General Assembly - Contributions Prohibited
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Ways and Means 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:13 PM
Click to return on the top page