Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 257
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "public school employee" for the purposes of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for certificated employees in Carroll County to include Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps (JROTC) instructors.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0570
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 257
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 257
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
(   6-401 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page