Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - General Services)
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding as conditions precedent for a sale of a certain superfluous armory by the Maryland Military Department that the Maryland Military Department has complied with a certain provision of law, the Department of Planning has made a certain determination that no unit of State government is interested in the property, and the Board of Public Works has approved the sale.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2020
Legislative Date
9/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2020 9/26/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {664230/1 Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Judiciary 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 11:16 AM
Click to return on the top page