Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who meets certain threshold standing requirements under federal law has an unconditional right and authority to intervene in a civil action that the State initiates in State court to require compliance with certain water pollution control measures; requiring a person exercising a certain right of intervention to intervene in accordance with the applicable practices, procedures, and laws in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0076
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {378272/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Water Pollution Control - Intervention in Civil Actions - Rights and Authority
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
(   9-344.1 )
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page