Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Gaming - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senators King, Augustine, Beidle, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kelley, Kramer, Miller, Patterson, Peters, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to repeal a certain prohibition on the authority of the General Assembly to authorize additional forms or the expansion of commercial gaming; repealing the authority of the General Assembly to authorize, through the use of a certain referendum, additional forms or the expansion of commercial gaming; conforming certain provisions of the Maryland Constitution to changes made by a certain referendum; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0605
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - Gaming - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Constitutional Amendment - Gaming - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - Gaming - Expansion
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 28
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 28
Text - Third - Constitutional Amendment - Gaming - Expansion
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 30
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Referred Ways and Means 31
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:00 PM