Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit – Public Safety Officer – Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey, Edwards, Gallion, Griffith, Guzzone, King, Miller, Peters, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by a public safety officer; repealing a certain limitation on the amount of the credit; requiring the governing body of a county or municipal corporation that authorizes the credit to establish, by law, the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of eligibility for the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0420
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {169738/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments {169738/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit – Public Safety Officer – Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:59 PM