Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the proposals the Maryland Department of Health is required to prioritize in awarding grants under the Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program; requiring a local behavioral health authority to make certain information available to the public; requiring the Governor to include in the annual operating budget appropriations of $5,000,000 in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2025; requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2023, that at least one-third of the appropriation be used for grants for mobile crisis teams; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0108
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {706780/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable with Amendments {706780/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:22 PM
Click to return on the top page