Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a certain review of certain information technology platforms used by certain health occupations boards and make certain recommendations on the feasibility and cost of developing a certain common information technology platform; and requiring the Department to report certain findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0224
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1045 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:35 PM
Click to return on the top page