Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "practice social work" to include counseling for alcohol and drug use and addictive behaviors and to clarify that it includes, for certain individuals, the treatment of biopsychosocial conditions under the supervision of a licensed social worker-clinical; requiring the State Board of Social Work Examiners, under certain circumstances, to approve licensees approved to engage in independent practice to provide supervision; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0527
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254539/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {266984/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kelly) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {254539/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {266984/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kelly) Adopted (134-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
(   19-101, 19-302 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page