Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion and Bailey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to use a fair market value determined in accordance with certain provisions of law for up to 2 years after the date on which the Foundation was first requested in writing to purchase the easement.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Text - Chapter - Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
(   2-511 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page