Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public High Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, by July 1, 2022, to develop a certain program of education on the dangers of gambling and gambling addiction to be provided in public high schools; requiring the program to be coordinated with other State agencies responsible for gambling addiction education; authorizing a county board of education, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, to require each public high school in the county to include instruction on the dangers of gambling one time for students in grades 9 through 12; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0322 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/13/2020
Legislative Date
8/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/13/2020 8/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public High Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:51 PM
Click to return on the top page