Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Lee, Peters, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 135
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that, if a petitioner or person eligible for relief files a certain motion to extend the term of a final peace order or final protective order during the term of the order and a hearing on the motion is not held before the order's original expiration date, the order is automatically extended and its terms remain in full force and effect until the hearing on the motion.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0250
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Final Protective Order - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {768371/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-4)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 135
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Final Protective Order - Extension
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {768371/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Judiciary 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-4) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 135
Text - Chapter - Peace Orders and Protective Orders – Extension
(   4-507 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:55 PM
Click to return on the top page