Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0226 - 2020RS
   CH0010 - 2021RS
Title
Highways – Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways – Modification
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 10 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Modifying a certain prohibition against the erection or maintenance of outdoor signs along or near expressways.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {147277/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-1)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-6)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Overridden (30-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (96-38)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 10 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {147277/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Highways – Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways – Modification
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-1) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-6) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Overridden (30-15)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (96-38)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 10 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Highways – Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways – Modification
(   8-701, 8-741, 8-744 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page