Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the term "sexual orientation" in the context of hate crimes; including gender identity in the list of characteristics on the basis of which a person may not commit certain acts; authorizing a court to require an offender convicted of hate crimes to complete an antibias education program in addition to any other penalties imposed; requiring the University System of Maryland to manage the development of an antibias education program by January 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0128
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0485 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203826/1
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {653424/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {203826/1 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {203826/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Floor Amendment {653424/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-32) 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Judiciary 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
(   12-120 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page