Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing licensing requirements for certain money transmission locations; altering certain net worth requirements for certain applicants for a license to engage in money transmission; requiring an applicant for a license to engage in money transmission to provide the address of each self-service financial kiosk in a certain application; specifying a $500 licensing fee that an applicant for a branch location license is required to pay; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Second Reading Passed 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 9 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:36 PM
Click to return on the top page