Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Child Tax Credit and Expansion of the Earned Income Credit
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income credit to allow certain residents to claim the credit; allowing certain taxpayers with federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year that is $6,000 or less to claim a credit against the State income tax for each qualified child in an amount equal to $500; allowing certain taxpayers to claim a refund in the amount of any excess credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0143
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0638 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/21/2020
Legislative Date
8/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Child Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {459931/1
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {459931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {423925/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (48-91)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-88)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Child Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {233929/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (47-91)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {743420/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (53-86)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {423925/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (48-91)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-88)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-44)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/21/2020 8/21/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Child Tax Credit
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {459931/1 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Committee Amendment {459931/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Amendment {423925/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (48-91) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Floor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-88) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Child Tax Credit
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Ways and Means 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {233929/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (47-91) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {743420/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (53-86) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {423925/1 (Delegate Thiam) Rejected (48-91) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Floor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (46-88) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (91-44) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Returned Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page